Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé Espejos y Cisneros

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642¹BornAlhama
15 Jul 166826.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 169351.2AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
5 Jul 169351.5Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga, Spain
2 Mar 170462.1DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Espejos y Cisneros:
Bishop Bartolomé Espejos y Cisneros (born 1642, died ) Bishop of Málaga

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 253
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 234, Number 1,456
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015