Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Barcia y Zambrana

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1691AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
21 Oct 1691Ordained BishopBishop of Cádiz, Spain
30 Nov 1695DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

MicroData Summary for José de Barcia y Zambrana (VIAF: 10761657)
Bishop José de Barcia y Zambrana (died ) Bishop of Cádiz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMálaga
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 207
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 233, Number 1,449
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1691, Number 17
  • ob/c2: CB, 17 Jul 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,038

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018