Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Marín y Rodezno

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1627¹BornNájera
28 Apr 168154.3AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
21 Sep 168154.7Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
12 Jan 170679.0DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Marín y Rodezno:
Bishop Juan Marín y Rodezno (born 1627, died ) Bishop of Badajoz

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 221, Number 1,373
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015