Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Lepe Orantes (Lope y Dorantes)

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1641BornSanlúcar de Barrameda
9 Apr 166624.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 168645.1AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
30 Nov 168645.4Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
5 Dec 170059.4DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Lepe Orantes (Lope y Dorantes):
Bishop Pedro de Lepe Orantes (Lope y Dorantes) (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,576
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 228, Number 1,415

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013