Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valerio de São Raimundo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹BornEvora
11 Jan 168361.0AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
10 May 168361.3Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
29 Jul 168967.5DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valerio de São Raimundo:
Bishop Valerio de São Raimundo O.P. (born 1622, died ) Bishop of Elvas

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,446
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 194
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015