Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Roano e Corrionero

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹Born
16 Feb 166045.1AppointedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
7 Mar 166045.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalý, Italy
27 Nov 167358.9AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
4 Jul 170388.5DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Roano e Corrionero (VIAF: 60250422)
Archbishop Giovanni Roano e Corrionero (born 1615, died ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillares, Diocese of Salamanca, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Giacomo degli Spagnoli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 276
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 146
  • b/c2: Episcopologio EspaŮol, Volume 1,500, Page 191, Number 1,200
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,660, Number 40
  • c34: AT, 9 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,078

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast