Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Joaquín Granados y Gálvez, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1734Born
10 Mar 178853.7AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
28 Sep 178854.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sonora, México
21 Feb 179459.6AppointedBishop of Durango, México
31 May 179459.9InstalledBishop of Durango, México
19 Aug 179460.1DiedBishop of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for José Joaquín Granados y Gálvez
Bishop José Joaquín Granados y Gálvez O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSedella, Spain

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 106, Number 549
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 19
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 202, and Page 383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018