Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Zamorana Romezal

Deceased

Bishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1696Born
19 Dec 175761.0AppointedBishop of Durango, México
1758²61.0Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
21 Dec 176872.0DiedBishop of Durango, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Zamorana Romezal
Bishop Pedro Zamorana Romezal (born , died ) Bishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Guardia, Spain

  • a bishop for 10.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 77, Number 383
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 202

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast