Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcos de Torres y Rueda

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹BornAlmazán, Spain
1620²32.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 164456.3SelectedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
14 Nov 164456.8ConfirmedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
1645²57.0Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
22 Apr 164961.3DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcos de Torres y Rueda:
Bishop Marcos de Torres y Rueda (died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 375
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 175, Number 1,087
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015