Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego de Guevara y Estrada

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612²BornMéxico
19 Jun 164129.5SelectedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
13 Jan 164230.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
Apr 164230.3DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Guevara y Estrada:
Archbishop Diego de Guevara y Estrada , Archbishop of Santo Domingo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014