Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego López de la Vega

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591²BornTortuera
29 Apr 164958.3SelectedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
23 Aug 164958.6ConfirmedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
6 Mar 165059.2Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
28 Jan 165867.1AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
5 Jun 165968.4DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego López de la Vega:
Bishop Diego López de la Vega (died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 269, and Page 143
  • bp/bd/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,506
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 179, Number 1,118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013