Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Ignacio González de Campillo Gómez del Valle

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1740BornVeta Grande
26 Mar 180463.8AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
5 Sep 180464.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
26 Feb 1813³72.8DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Ignacio González de Campillo Gómez del Valle:
Bishop Manuel Ignacio González de Campillo Gómez del Valle (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015