Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Luciano Becerra y Jiménez

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1784BornJalapa
23 Dec 183955.0AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
27 Dec 184864.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
Feb 184964.1InstalledBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
27 Sep 185267.7AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
17 Dec 185470.0DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary for José María Luciano Becerra y Jiménez
Bishop José María Luciano Becerra y Jiménez (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 556
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 149
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Dec 2016