Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ruíz de Morales y Molina, O.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1566AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
10 Dec 1572AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
8 Oct 1573InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
17 Jul 1576DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ruíz de Morales y Molina:
Bishop Antonio Ruíz de Morales y Molina O.S. (died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 77, Number 460
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 239, and Page 314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014