Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristovão da Sá e Lisboa, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1568¹Born
30 Aug 160436.6AppointedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
21 Nov 160436.8Ordained BishopBishop of Malacca, Singapore
12 Nov 161244.8AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
31 Mar 162254.2DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristovão da Sá e Lisboa
Archbishop Cristovão da Sá e Lisboa O.S.H. (born 1568, died ) Archbishop of Goa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a bishop for 17.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 228, and Page 195
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,604, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast