Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge de Santa Luzia, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malacca, Singapore


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Feb 1558AppointedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
3 Apr 1558Ordained BishopBishop of Malacca, Singapore
1578¹ResignedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
18 Jan 1579DiedBishop Emeritus of Malacca, Singapore

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jorge de Santa Luzia
Bishop Jorge de Santa Luzia O.P. (died ) Bishop of Malacca

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Dominique, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceGoa, Archdiocese of Goa, India

  • a bishop for 20.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1558, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018