Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Melchior Miguel Carneiro Leitão, S.J. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Nicaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1519¹Born
14 Mar 154324.2ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
23 Jan 155536.0AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Ethiopia
23 Jan 155536.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicaea
15 Dec 156041.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicaea
9 Jul 157758.5SucceededPatriarch of Ethiopia
19 Aug 158364.6DiedPatriarch of Ethiopia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Melchior Miguel Carneiro Leitão
Patriarch Melchior Miguel Carneiro Leitão S.J. (born 1519, died ) Patriarch of Ethiopia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoimbra, Diocese of Coimbra, Portugal
Ordained BishopGoa, Archdiocese of Goa, India
Death PlaceMacao, Diocese of Macau, China

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 257, and Page 97
  • ob/c2+: CB, 26 Jan 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018