Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo de São José, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malacca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1709³BornCacilhas, Portugal
11 Jan 174838.2SelectedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
19 Feb 174838.3ConfirmedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
Jan 1760³50.2DiedBishop of Malacca, Singapore

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerardo de São José:
Bishop Gerardo de São José O.P. (born , died Jan 1760) Bishop of Malacca

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 273
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015