Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Idiáquez Manrique

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579¹BornMadrid
26 May 161031.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
4 Feb 161334.0AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
17 Nov 161536.8DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Idiáquez Manrique:
Bishop Antonio Idiáquez Manrique (died ) Bishop of Segovia

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,823
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 310, and Page 151
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 127, Number 811

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015