Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maximiliano de Austria

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1555BornJaén
23 Sep 159640.9AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
16 Feb 159741.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cádiz, Spain
27 Aug 160145.8AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
21 Apr 160347.4AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
1 Jul 161458.6DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Maximiliano de Austria:
Archbishop Maximiliano de Austria (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,363
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013