Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Márquez de Prado

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1557¹BornEl Espinal
14 May 161255.4AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
21 Sep 161255.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
18 Jul 161659.5AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
9 Jul 161861.5AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
7 Nov 162164.8DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Márquez de Prado:
Bishop Alfonso Márquez de Prado (died ) Bishop of Segovia

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 136, and Page 310
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 174
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 129, Number 821

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 28 Dec 2013