Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Alvarez Zapata, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹BornTorralba de Aragón
18 Jun 161250.4AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
1613²51.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
11 Mar 161351.1AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
13 Oct 162361.7DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Alvarez Zapata:
Bishop Juan Alvarez Zapata O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Solsona

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 118, and Page 144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,572
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 130, Number 830

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015