Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Z˙˝iga Sotomayor

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1564¹BornSanto TomÚ de Freijeiro
12 May 163167.4AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
10 Aug 163167.6Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
24 Jul 163369.6SelectedBishop of Zamora, Spain
9 Jan 163470.0ConfirmedBishop of Zamora, Spain
11 Nov 163773.9DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Z˙˝iga Sotomayor:
Bishop Diego Z˙˝iga Sotomayor (died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,840
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 103, and Page 376
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 154, Number 974

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014