Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóbal de la Cámara y Murga

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornArciniega
16 Jun 162757.4SelectedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
15 Nov 162757.8ConfirmedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
23 Jan 162858.0Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
7 May 163565.3AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
29 Apr 164171.3DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal de la Cámara y Murga:
Bishop Cristóbal de la Cámara y Murga (died ) Bishop of Salamanca

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 132, and Page 300
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 150, Number 956

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015