Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Queipo de Llano Flores

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584²BornCangas de Tineo
10 Jan 163955.0AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
10 Apr 163955.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
18 Feb 164763.1AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
1 Nov 164763.8DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Queipo de Llano Flores:
Bishop Juan Queipo de Llano Flores (born 1584, died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,504
  • bd/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,401
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 271, and Page 194
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 166, Number 1,042
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015