Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé Santos de Risoba

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1582BornSaldaña
6 Jun 163351.3AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
26 Sep 163351.6AppointedBishop of León, Spain
29 Jan 163451.9Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
21 Jun 164967.3SelectedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
9 Dec 164967.8ConfirmedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
8 Feb 165774.9DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Santos de Risoba:
Bishop Bartolomé Santos de Risoba (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 79, and Page 311
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 218
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,844
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 160, Number 1,011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014