Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio González Acevedo

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1605Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 1633AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
2 Apr 1634Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
5 Oct 1637AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
14 Mar 1642DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio González Acevedo:
Bishop Antonio González Acevedo (died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 79, and Page 143
  • op/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,502
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,845
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013