Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Estelrich

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
17 May 1610AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarragona, Spain
17 May 1610AppointedTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
21 Dec 1610Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
14 Nov 1622AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
10 May 1626DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Estelrich
Bishop Juan Estelrich (died ) Bishop of Jaca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalma de Mallorca

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,847
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 177, and Page 205
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 127, Number 808
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018