Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Puig

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jun 1545AppointedBishop of Elne, France
23 Aug 1545Ordained BishopBishop of Elne, France
22 Oct 1552AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
13 Apr 1556AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
21 Nov 1559DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Puig
Bishop Miguel Puig (died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 57, Number 312
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192, and Page 212
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 324
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 20
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Number 7,679

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast