Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Segría (Cengria)

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Nov 1547AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
28 Nov 1547AppointedTitular Bishop of Christopolis
8 Apr 1548Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Christopolis
23 Jul 1568AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
16 Sep 1569AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
1570¹DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Segría (Cengria)
Archbishop Juan Segría (Cengria) (died 1570) Archbishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOnteniente, Archdiocese of Valencia, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia, Spain

  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 60, Number 335
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 269, and Page 166
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast