Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Planella

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jun 1361AppointedBishop of Elne, France
24 Mar 1371AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
22 Oct 1385DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Planella
Bishop Pedro de Planella (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 239, and Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast