Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Michel René Centène

Bishop of Vannes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1958 Born
21 Jun 199234.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Perpignan-Elne, France
27 Jun 199335.2Ordained PriestPriest of Perpignan-Elne, France
28 Jun 200547.2AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
16 Oct 200547.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France

MicroData Summary for Raymond Michel René Centène (VIAF: 9918644)
Bishop Raymond Michel René Centène (born ) Bishop of Vannes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBanyuls-sur-Mer

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vannes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,001

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast