Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Paul-Marie Vincent

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1911Born
29 Jun 194231.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 196352.5AppointedBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
11 Feb 196452.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
13 Jun 198675.0RetiredBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
2 Feb 199482.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul-Marie Vincent
Bishop Jean-Paul-Marie Vincent (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Etienne

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jan 2017