Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ascanio Maria Cardinal Sforza

Deceased

Administrator of Pavia

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia

Administrator of Cremona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1455BornCremona
17 Sep 147924.5AppointedAdministrator of Pavia, Italy
17 Mar 148429.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 148429.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
25 Oct 148429.6AppointedAdministrator of Novara, Italy
18 Apr 148530.1ResignedAdministrator of Novara, Italy
28 Jul 148631.4AppointedAdministrator of Cremona, Italy
1487²31.8AppointedAdministrator of Pesaro, Italy
May 1491³36.2ResignedAdministrator of Pesaro, Italy
26 Aug 149237.5ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
31 Aug 149237.5AppointedAdministrator of Eger, Hungary
Jan 1494³38.8AppointedAdministrator of Elne, France
31 Jan 149539.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
May 1495³40.2ResignedAdministrator of Elne, France
Jun 1497³42.2ResignedAdministrator of Eger, Hungary
27 May 150550.2DiedAdministrator of Pavia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Maria Sforza:
Cardinal Ascanio Maria Sforza (born , died ) Administrator of Pavia

  • a cardinal for 21.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Mar 1484

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013