Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfons de Eixea (de Tous)

Deceased

Bishop of Vic, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1409AppointedBishop of Elne, France
23 May 1410AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
3 Feb 1421DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfons de Eixea (de Tous)
Bishop Alfons de Eixea (de Tous) (died ) Bishop of Vic

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 239, and Page 526

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast