Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimundo de Escalas

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Aug 1377AppointedBishop of Elne, France
12 Mar 1378Ordained BishopBishop of Elne, France
17 Oct 1380AppointedBishop of Lleida, Spain
30 Mar 1386AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
24 Jul 1398DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Raimundo de Escalas:
Bishop Raimundo de Escalas (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 20.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 239, and Page 283
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 128
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013