Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Fernando de Loaces (Loazes), O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1497¹Born
5 May 154245.3AppointedBishop of Elne, France
24 Aug 154245.6Ordained BishopBishop of Elne, France
6 Aug 154346.5AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
28 Apr 155356.3AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
26 Apr 156063.3AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
18 Feb 156669.1AppointedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
28 Apr 156770.3AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
26 Jul 156770.5InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
29 Feb 156871.1DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Loaces (Loazes) (VIAF: 83643864)
Patriarch Fernando de Loaces (Loazes) O.P. (born 1497, died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrihuela
Ordained BishopRoyal Palace, Chapel, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona
Death PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 54, Number 294
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 308, and Page 325
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 186, and Page 212
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192, and Page 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1542, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast