Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Requeséns

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jul 1537AppointedBishop of Elne, France
5 May 1542AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
21 Nov 1548DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Requeséns
Bishop Jerónimo Requeséns (died ) Bishop of Tortosa

EventPlace
Death PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 49, Number 258
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192, and Page 186
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,537, Number 25*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast