Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Magarola Fontanet

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1571³Born
26 Oct 162251.0AppointedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
22 Mar 162755.4AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
22 Mar 163462.4AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
20 Dec 163463.2DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Magarola Fontanet
Bishop Pedro Magarola Fontanet (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 182, and Page 367
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 208
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 143, Number 914
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast