Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Mártir Coma, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510¹Born
14 Jan 156959.0AppointedBishop of Elne, France
22 May 156959.3Ordained BishopBishop of Elne, France
5 Mar 157868.1DiedBishop of Elne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Mártir Coma (VIAF: 303998091)
Bishop Pedro Mártir Coma O.P. (born 1510, died ) Bishop of Elne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolsona
Ordained BishopSancta Catarina, Monastery, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain

  • a bishop for 8.7 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,344
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 80, Number 478
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1569, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast