Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Doria

Deceased

Administrator of Tarragona, Spain

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1495Born
Jan 152934.0Elevated to Cardinal
15 Nov 152934.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Tommaso in Parione
12 Jan 153035.0AppointedAdministrator of Elne, France
2 Oct 153237.7AppointedAdministrator of Huesca, Spain
8 May 153338.3AppointedAdministrator of Tarragona, Spain
13 Apr 153439.2AppointedAdministrator of Noli, Italy
15 Nov 153641.8AppointedAdministrator of Nebbio, France
28 Jun 153843.4ResignedAdministrator of Nebbio, France
25 Feb 154954.1ResignedAdministrator of Noli, Italy
29 May 155560.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
25 Mar 155863.2DiedAdministrator of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Doria
Girolamo Cardinal Doria (born 1495, died ) Administrator of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa

  • a cardinal for 29.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, Jan 1529
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 254, and Page 308
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 249, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018