Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Prieto Orduņa, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1578BornBurgos
6 Oct 162749.1AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
21 May 162849.7Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
18 Feb 163657.5AppointedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
30 Oct 163759.2DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Prieto Orduņa:
Bishop Gaspar Prieto Orduņa O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a bishop for 9.4 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,403
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 182, and Page 78
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 150, Number 954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015