Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Ortiz Sotomayor

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1635AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
25 Feb 1636Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
17 Apr 1640DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Ortiz Sotomayor:
Bishop Gabriel Ortiz Sotomayor (died ) Bishop of Badajoz

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 269
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,847
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 162, Number 1,023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015