Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Fernández Zorrilla

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Mar 1616AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
23 Jul 1618AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
14 Jan 1627SelectedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
14 Jun 1627ConfirmedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
11 Aug 1637DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Fernández Zorrilla:
Bishop Pedro Fernández Zorrilla (died ) Bishop of Pamplona

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 269, and Page 243
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 271
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • bp/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 133, Number 851
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015