Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal Casanova, O.P. †

Deceased

Administrator of Gerona, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1387²Born
8 Jul 140316.5EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Mar 141427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1424²37.0AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
28 Nov 142538.9AppointedBishop of Elne, France
29 Dec 142538.9ConfirmedBishop of Elne, France
30 Oct 143043.8AppointedAdministrator of Elne, France
8 Nov 143043.8Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
8 Nov 143043.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
4 Jul 143144.5Elevated to Cardinal
8 Aug 143144.6AppointedAdministrator of Gerona, Spain
31 Aug 143144.6ResignedAdministrator of Elne, France
1 Mar 143649.1DiedAdministrator of Gerona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Casanova
Juan Cardinal Casanova O.P. (born 1387, died ) Administrator of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona
Death PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria Novella, Church, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Dominican, Church, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a priest for 21.9 years
  • a cardinal for 5.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Nov 1430
  • b: CB, 18 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast