Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ausiás Carbonell, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Titular Bishop of Christopolis


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Apr 1509AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
16 Apr 1509AppointedTitular Bishop of Christopolis
6 Aug 1509Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Christopolis
9 Dec 1532DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ausiás Carbonell
Bishop Ausiás Carbonell O.P. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJijona

  • a bishop for 23.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 26, Number 74
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018