Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ferrer y Milán, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹BornValencia
30 Sep 168643.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
30 Sep 168643.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
19 Dec 169148.9AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
29 Oct 170764.8DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ferrer y Milán:
Bishop Antonio Ferrer y Milán C.O. (born 1643, died ) Bishop of Segorbe

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 217, and Page 351
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 229, Number 1,424
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 11 May 2015