Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Tomás de Rocaberti, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1627BornPerelada
17 Nov 164619.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
167042.8AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Nov 167649.7SelectedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
8 Feb 167749.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
14 Feb 167749.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
29 Jun 167750.3InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
13 Jun 169972.3DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Tomás de Rocaberti:
Archbishop Juan Tomás de Rocaberti O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 215, Number 1,338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013