Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Aparici Gilart

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

Titular Bishop of Croae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Feb 1633³BornBenifaraig
25 Jan 169460.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
25 Jan 169460.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Croae
2 May 169461.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Croae
1 Jan 171177.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Aparici Gilart:
Bishop Isidoro Aparici Gilart (born Feb 1633, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,638
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 176
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 236, Number 1,467
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 11 May 2015