Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal de Castro

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1431Born
19 Feb 147947.9SelectedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
20 Mar 147947.9ConfirmedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
19 Feb 149664.9Elevated to Cardinal
24 Feb 149664.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
6 Nov 149968.6AppointedAdministrator of Schleswig, Germany
29 Jul 150271.3ResignedAdministrator of Schleswig, Germany
29 Sep 150675.5DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Juan de Castro
Juan Cardinal de Castro (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Spain
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 10.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1496
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 239, and Page 83
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1479, Number 13*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast